Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Drago, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Termoli, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Nov 1599AppointedBishop of Termoli, Italy
19 Dec 1599Ordained BishopBishop of Termoli, Italy
3 Jan 1601DiedBishop of Termoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alberto Drago
Bishop Alberto Drago O.P. (died ) Bishop of Termoli

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 334
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 312
  • ob/c2+: CB, 29 Sep 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1599, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast