Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedetto Mandina, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Caserta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1547¹Born
31 Jan 159447.0AppointedBishop of Caserta, Italy
6 Feb 159447.0Ordained BishopBishop of Caserta, Italy
2 Jul 160457.5DiedBishop of Caserta, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Mandina (VIAF: 37733116)
Bishop Benedetto Mandina C.R. (born 1547, died ) Bishop of Caserta

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS.Silvestre au Quirinal, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 138
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 156
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1594, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018