Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diomede Carafa

Deceased

Bishop of Tricarico, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Aug 1605AppointedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
28 Aug 1605Ordained BishopBishop of Tricarico, Italy
12 Jan 1609DiedBishop of Tricarico, Italy

MicroData Summary for Diomede Carafa
Bishop Diomede Carafa (died ) Bishop of Tricarico

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 343
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1605, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018