Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pompeio Cardinal Arrigoni

Deceased

Archbishop of Benevento

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1552²BornRome
5 Jun 159644.4Elevated to Cardinal
21 Jun 159644.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
24 Jan 159745.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
7 Feb 160755.0AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
24 Feb 160755.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
4 Apr 161664.2DiedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pompeio Arrigoni:
Pompeio Cardinal Arrigoni (died ) Archbishop of Benevento

  • a bishop for 9.1 years
  • a cardinal for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Jun 1596
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 113
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1607, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 9 Feb 2015