Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Federici

Deceased

Bishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1571¹Born
31 Aug 160938.6AppointedBishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy
8 Sep 160938.6Ordained BishopBishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy
1613¹42.0DiedBishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Federici
Bishop Pietro Federici (born 1571, died 1613) Bishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 374
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1609, Number 32
  • ob/c2: CB, 23 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jan 2017