Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Anselmo Cardinal Marzato, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Chieti

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1543³BornMonopoli
1572²28.1ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
9 Jun 160460.5Elevated to Cardinal
24 Jun 160460.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
12 Feb 160763.2AppointedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
24 Feb 160763.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
17 Aug 160763.7DiedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anselmo Marzato:
Anselmo Cardinal Marzato O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Archbishop of Chieti

  • a bishop for .4 years
  • a cardinal for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Jun 1604
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 332
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1607, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 8 Feb 2015