Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bonviso Cardinal Bonvisi

Deceased

Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa)

Cardinal-Priest of San Biagio dell’Anello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1551BornLucca
3 Mar 159947.6Elevated to Cardinal
17 Mar 159947.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
5 Jul 159947.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Biagio dell’Anello
18 Mar 160250.6AppointedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
21 Apr 160250.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
1 Sep 160352.1DiedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy

MicroData Summary for Bonviso Bonvisi:
Bonviso Cardinal Bonvisi (born , died ) Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa)

  • a bishop for 1.3 years
  • a cardinal for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 3 Mar 1599
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 110
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1602, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 4 Feb 2015