Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro del Caccia

Deceased

Bishop of Pistoia


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Jul 1600AppointedBishop of Pistoia, Italy
9 Jul 1600Ordained BishopBishop of Pistoia, Italy
4 Sep 1649DiedBishop of Pistoia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro del Caccia:
Bishop Alessandro del Caccia (died ) Bishop of Pistoia

  • a bishop for 49.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 281
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 36, Number 184
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 275
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1600, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 24 Feb 2015