Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hugh O’Reilly

Deceased

Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580¹Born
9 Jun 162545.4AppointedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
19 Jul 162646.5Ordained BishopBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
21 Aug 162848.6AppointedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
Feb 1653³73.0DiedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hugh O’Reilly
Archbishop Hugh O’Reilly (born 1580, died Feb 1653) Archbishop of Armagh

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSaint Peter, Church, Drogheda
Death PlaceTrinity Island

  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 95, and Page 212
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 217
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 17
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Number 4,950
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Number 5,244

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 1 Sep 2020

Quantcast