Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Orazio Spannocchi

Deceased

Bishop of Chiusi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1553¹BornSienne
12 Jan 160956.0AppointedBishop of Chiusi, Italy
18 Jan 160956.0Ordained BishopBishop of Chiusi, Italy
5 Sep 162067.6DiedBishop of Chiusi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Orazio Spannocchi:
Bishop Orazio Spannocchi (died ) Bishop of Chiusi

  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 155
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1609, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 9 Feb 2015