Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Max Heinrich von Bayern

Deceased

Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

Bishop of Hildesheim

Bishop of Liège


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1621BornMünchen
18 Jan 163311.2SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany
23 Nov 163312.1ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany
10 Feb 164220.3SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
17 May 164220.6ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
19 Oct 164928.0SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Liège, Belgium
19 Jul 165028.7ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Liège, Belgium
13 Sep 165028.9SucceededBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
13 Sep 165028.9SucceededArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
13 Sep 165028.9SucceededBishop of Liège, Belgium
8 Oct 165130.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Oct 165130.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
3 Jun 168866.6DiedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Max Heinrich von Bayern:
Archbishop Max Heinrich von Bayern (born , died ) Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 36.6 years
  • a bishop for 36.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 156, and Page 203
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 219
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1651, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015