Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume-Samuel de Verthamon de Chavagnac

Deceased

Bishop of Lušon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1693¹Born
3 Jul 173744.5SelectedBishop of Lušon, France
16 Dec 173744.9ConfirmedBishop of Lušon, France
2 Feb 173845.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lušon, France
1 Nov 175865.8DiedBishop of Lušon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume-Samuel de Verthamon de Chavagnac
Bishop Guillaume-Samuel de Verthamon de Chavagnac (born 1693, died ) Bishop of Lušon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLimoges

  • a bishop for 20.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les ╔vŔques et les ArchevŔques de France
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1738, Number 4
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 267

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018