Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Xavier Jacques Marie Loizeau

Bishop Emeritus of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1939 Born
28 Jun 196525.9Ordained PriestPriest
10 Nov 199758.3AppointedBishop of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron), France
25 Jan 199858.5Ordained BishopBishop of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron), France
7 Nov 201475.3RetiredBishop of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron), France

MicroData Summary for François-Xavier Jacques Marie Loizeau
Bishop François-Xavier Jacques Marie Loizeau (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaillé

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,228
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Nov 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018