Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alain Castet

Bishop Emeritus of Luçon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1950 Born
16 Jun 197424.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
28 Jun 197525.1Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
14 Apr 200857.9AppointedBishop of Luçon, France
29 Jun 200858.1Ordained BishopBishop of Luçon, France
12 Oct 201767.4ResignedBishop of Luçon, France

MicroData Summary for Alain Castet (VIAF: 183597674)
Bishop Alain Castet (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Luçon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFloirac, Archdiocese of Bordeaux (-Bazas)
Ordained DeaconSt-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Luçon, Diocese of Luçon

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Luçon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Apr 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,769
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Oct 2017
  • od/c01: CB, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 6 Jul 2018

Quantcast