Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gabriel Justice Yaw Anokye

Archbishop of Kumasi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1960 BornEmenaa
16 Jul 198828.1Ordained PriestPriest of Kumasi, Ghana
30 Oct 200343.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kumasi, Ghana
30 Oct 200343.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Cellae in Mauretania
17 Jan 200443.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cellae in Mauretania
26 Mar 200847.8AppointedBishop of Obuasi, Ghana
15 May 201252.0AppointedArchbishop of Kumasi, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Justice Yaw Anokye:
Archbishop Gabriel Justice Yaw Anokye (born ) Archbishop of Kumasi

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kumasi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,512
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Mar 2008
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 May 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 23 Nov 2014