Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Jourens (Joffevry)

Deceased

Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Aug 1348AppointedBishop of Riez, France
22 Mar 1349Ordained BishopBishop of Riez, France
2 Mar 1352AppointedBishop of Valence and Die, France
5 May 1354AppointedBishop of Luçon, France
20 Nov 1354AppointedBishop of Elne, France
27 Feb 1357AppointedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
1361¹DiedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Jourens (Joffevry)
Bishop Jean Jourens (Joffevry) (died 1361) Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay

  • a bishop for 11.7 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,316
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 417, and Page 513
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 315, and Page 239
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 91

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 20 May 2019

Quantcast