Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanislas-Gabriel-Henri Baudry, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Xichang [Ningyüan], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1887Born
28 Sep 191325.8Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
18 Mar 192739.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ningyüanfu, China
18 Mar 192739.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Isauropolis
30 Oct 192739.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Isauropolis
11 Apr 194658.3AppointedBishop of Xichang [Ningyüan], China
6 Aug 195466.6DiedBishop of Xichang [Ningyüan], China

MicroData Summary for Stanislas-Gabriel-Henri Baudry
Bishop Stanislas-Gabriel-Henri Baudry M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Xichang [Ningyüan]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Pommeraie-sur-Sèvre, France

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast