Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominique Bonnet, C.S.Sp.

Bishop Emeritus of Mouila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1939 BornAntigny, France
29 Jun 196627.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
8 Nov 199657.6AppointedBishop of Mouila, Gabon
11 Jan 199757.7Ordained BishopBishop of Mouila, Gabon
19 Jan 201373.7ResignedBishop of Mouila, Gabon

MicroData Summary for Dominique Bonnet:
Bishop Dominique Bonnet C.S.Sp. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Mouila

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mouila.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,909
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Jan 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013