Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Etienne-Célestin Enoch

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rennes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1742Born
30 Jan 180562.1SelectedBishop of Rennes, France
22 Mar 180562.3ConfirmedBishop of Rennes, France
21 Apr 180562.4Ordained BishopBishop of Rennes, France
12 Nov 1819³76.9RetiredBishop of Rennes, France
19 May 182582.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Rennes, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Etienne-Célestin Enoch
Bishop Etienne-Célestin Enoch (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rennes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHénin-Liétard

  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 319
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1805, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018