Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Cornulier

Deceased

Bishop of Rennes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1575²BornNantes
3 Apr 161742.2AppointedBishop of Tréguier, France
7 May 161944.3SelectedBishop of Rennes, France
29 Jul 161944.5ConfirmedBishop of Rennes, France
21 Jul 163964.5DiedBishop of Rennes, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Cornulier:
Bishop Pierre Cornulier (died ) Bishop of Rennes

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 293, and Page 342
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1617, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 24 Feb 2015