Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume de Bris

Deceased

Bishop of Dol, France


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Apr 1384AppointedBishop of Rennes, France
27 Aug 1386AppointedBishop of Dol, France
2 Feb 1391DiedBishop of Dol, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume de Bris
Bishop Guillaume de Bris (died ) Bishop of Dol

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 226, and Page 417

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast