Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel Guibé

Deceased

Bishop of Rennes, France


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Jan 1477AppointedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
14 Jan 1478AppointedBishop of Dol, France
29 Mar 1482AppointedBishop of Rennes, France
1502²DiedBishop of Rennes, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michel Guibé
Bishop Michel Guibé (died 1502) Bishop of Rennes

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 175, and Page 145
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 222
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,477, Number 10*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast