Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Etienne-Parfait-Martin Maurel de Mons

Deceased

Archbishop of Avignon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1752BornAix-en-Provence
30 Jan 180552.8SelectedBishop of Mende, France
22 Mar 180552.9ConfirmedBishop of Mende, France
21 Apr 180553.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mende, France
14 Aug 182169.3SelectedBishop of Avignon, France
24 Sep 182169.4ConfirmedBishop of Avignon, France
21 Nov 182169.6InstalledBishop of Avignon, France
6 Oct 182270.5AppointedArchbishop of Avignon, France
6 Oct 183078.5DiedArchbishop of Avignon, France

MicroData Summary for Etienne-Parfait-Martin Maurel de Mons:
Archbishop Etienne-Parfait-Martin Maurel de Mons (born , died ) Archbishop of Avignon

  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 100, and Page 265

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013