Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maria Nicolaus Silvester Guillon

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1760BornParis, France
17 May 178827.3Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 183271.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos, Titular Sees
7 Jul 183372.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos, Titular Sees
16 Oct 184786.7DiedTitular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos, Titular Sees

MicroData Summary for Maria Nicolaus Silvester Guillon (VIAF: 64041341)
Bishop Maria Nicolaus Silvester Guillon (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 253
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1833, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Aug 2016