Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Severin Jacob Gertken, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of Saint Peter-Muenster, Saskatchewan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1881BornRichmond, MN, USA
11 Jul 190018.9ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
7 Jun 190725.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
8 Sep 192645.1SelectedAbbot of Saint Peter-Muenster, Saskatchewan, Canada
5 Oct 192645.1ConfirmedAbbot of Saint Peter-Muenster, Saskatchewan, Canada
10 Mar 196078.6DiedAbbot of Saint Peter-Muenster, Saskatchewan, Canada

MicroData Summary for Severin Jacob Gertken:
Abbot Severin Jacob Gertken O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot of Saint Peter-Muenster

  • a priest for 52.7 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015