Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Dominic Fenwick, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1768Born
26 Mar 179021.6Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Preachers
23 Feb 179324.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
19 Jun 182152.8AppointedBishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
13 Jan 182253.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
26 Sep 183264.1DiedBishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Dominic Fenwick
Bishop Edward Dominic Fenwick O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Cincinnati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. Mary's County, MD

  • a priest for 39.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 151
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,822, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast