Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Giovanni Vincenzo (Lodovico) de Gallo Laculebero, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Santa Severina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1760³BornLagonegro
6 Mar 178424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
2 Jun 182464.2SelectedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
12 Jul 182464.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
18 Jul 182464.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
3 Apr 184888.0DiedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Giovanni Vincenzo (Lodovico) de Gallo Laculebero
Archbishop Giuseppe Giovanni Vincenzo (Lodovico) de Gallo Laculebero O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Archbishop of Santa Severina

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 344
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1824, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Jun 2016