Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Bede Slater, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mauritius

Titular Bishop of Ruspae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1774¹BornLiverpool, Great Britain
1794²20.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
1798²24.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Jun 181844.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ruspae
28 Jun 181844.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ruspae
2 Mar 181945.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mauritius
9 Aug 183157.6ResignedVicar Apostolic of Mauritius
15 Jul 183258.5DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mauritius

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edward Bede Slater
Bishop Edward Bede Slater O.S.B. (born 1774, died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mauritius

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 327
  • prof/op: CB, 13 Feb 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 10 May 2016