Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Vincenzo Maria Strambi, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Macerata e Tolentino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1745BornCivitavecchia
19 Dec 176723.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
20 Jul 180156.6AppointedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
26 Jul 180156.6Ordained BishopBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
11 Nov 182378.9ResignedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
1 Jan 182479.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
26 Apr 1925Beatified
11 Jun 1950Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Vincenzo Maria Strambi:
Bishop St. Vincenzo Maria Strambi C.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Macerata e Tolentino

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 247

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013