Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Mami

Deceased

Bishop of Città della Pieve, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1759Born
23 May 178222.7Ordained PriestPriest
2 Oct 181859.0AppointedBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy
4 Oct 181859.0Ordained BishopBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy
18 Jun 1837³77.7DiedBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giulio Mami
Bishop Giulio Mami (born , died ) Bishop of Città della Pieve

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCesena

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,837
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 152
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,818, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast