Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gennaro di Giacomo

Deceased

Bishop of Alife, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1796Born
18 Mar 182023.4Ordained PriestPriest
7 Oct 184852.0SelectedBishop of Alife, Italy
22 Dec 184852.2ConfirmedBishop of Alife, Italy
22 Dec 184852.2AppointedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
4 Mar 184952.4Ordained BishopBishop of Alife, Italy
Jul 185255.7ResignedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
1 Jul 187881.7DiedBishop of Alife, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gennaro di Giacomo (VIAF: 88992686)
Bishop Gennaro di Giacomo (born , died ) Bishop of Alife

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli
Ordained BishopCathedral, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 90
  • ob/c2+: CB, 7 Jul 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 30 Dec 2016