Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Saverio Petagna

Deceased

Bishop of Castellammare di Stabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1812BornNapoli
19 Dec 183523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
11 Jan 185037.0SelectedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
20 May 185037.4ConfirmedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
16 Jun 185037.5Ordained BishopBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
18 Dec 187866.0DiedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio Petagna (VIAF: 121573785)
Bishop Francesco Saverio Petagna (born , died ) Bishop of Castellammare di Stabia

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 191
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 Jan 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1850, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Dec 2016