Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe de’ Bianchi Dottula

Deceased

Archbishop of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1809BornNapoli
23 Mar 183324.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Nov 184839.8SelectedArchbishop of Trani e Nazareth e Bisceglie, Italy
22 Dec 184839.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Trani e Nazareth e Bisceglie, Italy
4 Mar 184940.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Trani e Nazareth e Bisceglie, Italy
22 Sep 189283.6DiedArchbishop of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe de’ Bianchi Dottula:
Archbishop Giuseppe de’ Bianchi Dottula (born , died ) Archbishop of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie)

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 43.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 561
  • ob/c2+: CB, 7 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013