Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio de Franci

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Ostia (-Velletri)

Titular Bishop of Canatha


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1772³BornFilacciano
19 Sep 179523.6Ordained PriestPriest
2 Oct 183765.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy
2 Oct 183765.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Canatha
15 Oct 183765.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canatha
1852¹79.9ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy
1855²82.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Franci
Bishop Antonio de Franci (born , died 1855) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Ostia (-Velletri)

  • a priest for 59.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 131
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1837, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Aug 2016