Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Berettini

Deceased

Bishop of Teramo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1765³BornAquila
28 Oct 178924.3Ordained PriestPriest
4 May 182963.8SelectedBishop of Teramo, Italy
5 Jul 183065.0ConfirmedBishop of Teramo, Italy
11 Jul 183065.0Ordained BishopBishop of Teramo, Italy
29 Oct 184984.3DiedBishop of Teramo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Berettini:
Bishop Alessandro Berettini (born , died ) Bishop of Teramo

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013