Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gennaro de Rubertis

Deceased

Bishop of Termoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1771BornLucito
20 Sep 179422.9Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jan 182755.2SelectedBishop of Termoli, Italy
9 Apr 182755.4ConfirmedBishop of Termoli, Italy
17 Apr 182755.4Ordained BishopBishop of Termoli, Italy
1 Sep 184573.8DiedBishop of Termoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gennaro de Rubertis (VIAF: 89588294)
Bishop Gennaro de Rubertis (born , died ) Bishop of Termoli

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1845
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 366
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1827, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Jun 2016