Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Muccioli

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Agathopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1773BornRoma, Italy
24 Sep 179622.8Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 182248.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Agathopolis
21 Apr 182248.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agathopolis
1837¹63.1DiedTitular Bishop of Agathopolis

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Muccioli
Bishop Gregorio Muccioli (born , died 1837) Titular Bishop of Agathopolis

  • a priest for 40.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 61
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1822, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Aug 2016