Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Segna

Deceased

Bishop of Marsi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1758BornPoggio Cinolfo
21 Dec 178224.9Ordained PriestPriest of Marsi, Italy
22 Mar 182466.1SelectedBishop of Marsi, Italy
3 May 182466.2ConfirmedBishop of Marsi, Italy
9 May 182466.2Ordained BishopBishop of Marsi, Italy
8 Mar 184082.1DiedBishop of Marsi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Segna
Bishop Giuseppe Segna (born , died ) Bishop of Marsi

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 254
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1824, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 31 May 2016