Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emanuele Maria Bellorado, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

Bishop of Acerra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1765BornNapoli
5 Jul 178924.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
22 Mar 182458.7SelectedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
24 May 182458.9ConfirmedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
30 May 182458.9Ordained BishopBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
1 Nov 182762.3SelectedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
28 Jan 182862.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
24 Jan 182963.6SelectedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
24 Jan 182963.6SelectedBishop of Acerra, Italy
18 May 182963.9ConfirmedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
18 May 182963.9ConfirmedBishop of Acerra, Italy
29 Oct 183368.3DiedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Emanuele Maria Bellorado:
Bishop Emanuele Maria Bellorado O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1834
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 61, and Page 141
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 321

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013