Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Saverio d’Urso, O.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ugento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1770BornRuffano
30 Nov 179322.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Minims
20 Dec 182454.0AppointedBishop of Ugento, Italy
21 Dec 182454.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ugento, Italy
24 Apr 182655.3DiedBishop of Ugento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio d’Urso
Bishop Francesco Saverio d’Urso O.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Ugento

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 383
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Jun 2016