Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Parigini

Deceased

Bishop of Urbania-Sant’Angelo in Vado


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1779BornCol della Noce
18 Dec 180223.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 Apr 183354.2AppointedBishop of Urbania-Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy
1 May 183354.3Ordained BishopBishop of Urbania-Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy
24 Dec 184869.9DiedBishop of Urbania-Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Parigini:
Bishop Lorenzo Parigini (born , died ) Bishop of Urbania-Sant’Angelo in Vado

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1842
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013