Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Antonio Maria Traversi

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1765BornVenetia
22 Dec 178722.8Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jul 183671.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
17 Jul 183671.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
21 Feb 183974.0AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
21 Sep 184277.6DiedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Traversi:
Patriarch Antonio Maria Traversi (born , died ) Titular Patriarch of Constantinople

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 161, and Page 278

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013