Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Antonio Maria Gianelli

Deceased

Bishop of Bobbio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1789BornCarro
28 May 181223.1Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 183748.6SelectedBishop of Bobbio, Italy
12 Feb 183848.8ConfirmedBishop of Bobbio, Italy
6 May 183849.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bobbio, Italy
7 Jun 184657.2DiedBishop of Bobbio, Italy
19 Apr 1925Beatified
21 Oct 1951Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Antonio Maria Gianelli:
Bishop St. Antonio Maria Gianelli (born , died ) Bishop of Bobbio

  • a priest for 34.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 114

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013