Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Riccardi

Deceased

Bishop of Boiano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1778BornRuvo
27 Apr 183657.6SelectedBishop of Boiano, Italy
11 Jul 183657.8ConfirmedBishop of Boiano, Italy
16 Jul 183657.8Ordained BishopBishop of Boiano, Italy
19 Dec 185476.2DiedBishop of Boiano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Riccardi
Bishop Giuseppe Riccardi (born , died ) Bishop of Boiano

  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 151
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 114
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1836, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Aug 2016