Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Albertino Philippe Laurent Marie Bellenghi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Nicosia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1757BornForlimpopoli, Italy
22 Sep 178123.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
23 Jun 182870.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicosia
13 Jul 182870.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicosia
22 Mar 183981.4DiedTitular Archbishop of Nicosia

MicroData Summary for Albertino Philippe Laurent Marie Bellenghi (VIAF: 88787787)
Archbishop Albertino Philippe Laurent Marie Bellenghi O.S.B. (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Nicosia

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 283
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1828, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Jul 2016