Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Pietro Augustoni, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Porphyreon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1770BornGubbio, Italy
14 Jul 179322.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
28 Sep 182959.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Porphyreon
4 Oct 182959.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Porphyreon
23 Mar 183968.5DiedTitular Bishop of Porphyreon

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Pietro Augustoni
Bishop Giovanni Pietro Augustoni O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Porphyreon

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 312
  • c34: CB, 18 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1829, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Aug 2016