Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Franchini

Deceased

Bishop of Nicotera e Tropea, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1792³Born
23 Sep 181523.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Mar 183239.9SelectedBishop of Nicotera e Tropea, Italy
2 Jul 183240.2ConfirmedBishop of Nicotera e Tropea, Italy
15 Jul 183240.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nicotera e Tropea, Italy
24 May 185462.1DiedBishop of Nicotera e Tropea, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michele Franchini (VIAF: 88871951)
Bishop Michele Franchini (born , died ) Bishop of Nicotera e Tropea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonte Corvino

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 414
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 284
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1832, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast