Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Annibale-Raffaele Montalcini, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Santa Severina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1797Born
22 Jun 181720.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
16 Jun 182124.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
22 Sep 182124.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
7 Oct 184851.5SelectedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
11 Dec 184851.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
25 Feb 184951.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
23 Nov 186164.6DiedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Annibale-Raffaele Montalcini
Archbishop Annibale-Raffaele Montalcini C.SS.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Santa Severina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCrotone
Ordained BishopCathedral, Catanzaro, Diocese of Catanzaro

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,582
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 515
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1849, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018