Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vitaliano Provenzano

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Catanzaro, Italy

Titular Bishop of Loryma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1775Born
15 Apr 179722.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Catanzaro, Italy
18 May 179924.1Ordained PriestPriest of Catanzaro, Italy
11 Jul 183964.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Catanzaro, Italy
11 Jul 183964.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Loryma
Aug 1839²64.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Loryma
6 Jan 185781.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Catanzaro, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vitaliano Provenzano
Bishop Vitaliano Provenzano (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Catanzaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCatanzaro

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 243
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1839, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018