Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni de’ Conti Sabbioni

Deceased

Archbishop of Spoleto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1779³BornFermo
24 Sep 180324.3Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 183858.7AppointedArchbishop of Spoleto, Italy
18 Feb 183858.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Spoleto, Italy
26 Sep 185273.3DiedArchbishop of Spoleto, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni de’ Conti Sabbioni (VIAF: 89641528)
Archbishop Giovanni de’ Conti Sabbioni (born , died ) Archbishop of Spoleto

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 352
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1838, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Aug 2016